Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Javier Navarro Rodríguez

Bishop of Zamora, Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1949 BornTala
23 Dec 197829.2Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Apr 199242.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Apr 199242.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncaria
5 Jun 199242.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncaria
20 Jan 199949.2AppointedBishop of San Juan de los Lagos, Jalisco, México
3 May 200757.5AppointedBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México
25 Jul 200757.7InstalledBishop of Zamora, Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Javier Navarro Rodríguez:
Bishop Javier Navarro Rodríguez (born ) Bishop of Zamora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zamora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 May 2007
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,778
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014