Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Héctor López Alvarado

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Sereddeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1973 Born
24 Dec 200027.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
19 May 200228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
2 Feb 201844.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
2 Feb 201844.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sereddeli
21 Apr 201844.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sereddeli

MicroData Summary for Héctor López Alvarado
Father Héctor López Alvarado (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopSantuario de los Mártires, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2018
  • bp/bd/od/c01: CB, 2 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 22 Feb 2018