Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Sandoval Íñiguez

Archbishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Guadalupe e San Filippo Martire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1933 BornYahualica
27 Oct 195724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
3 Mar 198854.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
30 Apr 198855.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
11 Jul 199259.3SucceededBishop of Ciudad Juárez, Chihuahua, México
21 Apr 199461.1AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
26 Nov 199461.7Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199461.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Guadalupe e San Filippo Martire
7 Dec 201178.7RetiredArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Sandoval Íñiguez:
Juan Cardinal Sandoval Íñiguez (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guadalajara

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,008
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 18 Oct 2014