Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús González Hernández, O.F.M.

Prelate of Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1964 BornEtzatlán
24 Jun 199429.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Feb 201045.2AppointedPrelate of Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit, México
25 May 201045.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Jesús María (del Nayar), Nayarit, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús González Hernández:
Bishop José de Jesús González Hernández O.F.M. (born ) Prelate of Jesús María (del Nayar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Jesús María (del Nayar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,645

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013