Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Leopoldo González González

Bishop of Nogales, Sonora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1955 BornCañadas
27 May 198429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Nov 200550.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
15 Nov 200550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
25 Jan 200650.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
19 Mar 201560.1AppointedBishop of Nogales, Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for José Leopoldo González González:
Bishop José Leopoldo González González (born ) Bishop of Nogales

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nogales.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,045
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015