Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Muñoz Ochoa

Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Satafi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1968 Born
22 May 199728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Nov 202052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Nov 202052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafi
22 Feb 202152.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafi

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Muñoz Ochoa
Bishop Eduardo Muñoz Ochoa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopSantuario de los Mártires Mexicanos, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 16 Jan 2021
  • ~ob: CB, 16 Jan 2021
  • ob: CB, 8 Feb 2021
  • c34: CB, 22 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast