Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel González Villaseñor

Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Ploaghe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1963 Born
19 May 199127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Nov 202056.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
27 Nov 202056.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ploaghe
22 Feb 202157.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ploaghe

MicroData Summary for Manuel González Villaseñor
Bishop Manuel González Villaseñor (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopSantuario de los Mártires Mexicanos, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 16 Jan 2021
  • ~ob: CB, 16 Jan 2021
  • ob: CB, 8 Feb 2021
  • c34: CB, 22 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast