Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Engelberto Polino Sánchez

Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Vazari-Didda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1966 Born
26 May 199630.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
1 Jun 199731.2Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
2 Feb 201851.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
2 Feb 201851.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda
21 Apr 201852.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari-Didda

MicroData Summary for Engelberto Polino Sánchez
Bishop Engelberto Polino Sánchez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTeuchitlán, Jalisco
Ordained PriestAuditorio Benito Juárez, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopSantuario de los Mártires, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2018
  • od/c01: CB, 2 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 21 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast