Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Humberto Gutiérrez Valencia

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Titular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1941 Born
3 Dec 196726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
14 Feb 200866.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
14 Feb 200866.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
10 Apr 200866.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
2 Feb 201876.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Humberto Gutiérrez Valencia
Bishop Juan Humberto Gutiérrez Valencia (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Guadalajara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco
Ordained BishopSan Bernardo, Church, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,724
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast