Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Benjamín Castillo Plascencia

Bishop Emeritus of Celaya, Guanajuato, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1945 Born
14 Apr 197428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Nov 199954.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
18 Nov 199954.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufasar
8 Jan 200054.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufasar
8 Feb 200357.4AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
29 Apr 201064.6AppointedBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
24 Jun 201064.7InstalledBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México
12 Jun 202175.7RetiredBishop of Celaya, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for José Benjamín Castillo Plascencia
Bishop José Benjamín Castillo Plascencia (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Celaya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIxtlahuacán del Río
Ordained BishopSan Bernardo, Church, Guadalajara, Archdiocese of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Celaya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,678
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Jun 2021

Quantcast