Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Jesús Cardinal Posadas Ocampo

Deceased

Archbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Guadalupe e San Filippo Martire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1926BornSalvatierra
23 Sep 195023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
21 Mar 197043.4AppointedBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
14 Jun 197043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tijuana, Baja California Norte, México
28 Dec 198256.1AppointedBishop of Cuernavaca, Morelos, México
15 May 198760.5AppointedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
28 Jun 199164.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199164.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora di Guadalupe e San Filippo Martire
24 May 199366.5DiedArchbishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Jesús Posadas Ocampo:
Cardinal Juan Jesús Posadas Ocampo (born , died ) Archbishop of Guadalajara

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
  • a cardinal for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013