Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Campos Hernández, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San José del Amazonas

Titular Bishop of Vicus Augusti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1951 BornFresnillo
2 Aug 197928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Jan 199846.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru
17 Jan 199846.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Augusti
30 May 199847.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Augusti
8 Aug 201160.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Alberto Campos Hernández:
Bishop Alberto Campos Hernández O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San José del Amazonas

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of San José del Amazonas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013