Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Rodolfo Guibord Lévesque, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San José del Amazonas, Peru

Titular Bishop of Lemfocta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1923Born
29 Jun 195026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Sep 196743.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San José del Amazonas, Peru
14 Sep 196743.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lemfocta
30 Nov 196743.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lemfocta
29 May 196945.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru
17 Jan 199874.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of San José del Amazonas, Peru
9 May 200783.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of San José del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Rodolfo Guibord Lévesque
Bishop Lorenzo Rodolfo Guibord Lévesque O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San José del Amazonas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOttawa, Canada
Ordained BishopSaint Antoine de Padoue, Church, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast