Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Ferrucio Ceól, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Qichun [Kichow]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1911BornDaiano, Italy
192614.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Mar 193422.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jun 194836.9AppointedBishop of Qichun [Kichow], China
26 Sep 194837.2Ordained BishopBishop of Qichun [Kichow], China
1983²71.4ResignedBishop of Qichun [Kichow], China
23 Jun 199078.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Qichun [Kichow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Ferrucio Ceól:
Bishop Orazio Ferrucio Ceól O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Qichun [Kichow]

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991, Page 1,118
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013