Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Gualberto Cardinal Guevara y de la Cuba

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

Bishop of Peru, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1882BornVilla de Vitor
2 Jun 190623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Arequipa, Peru
15 Dec 194058.4AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
2 Mar 194158.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
23 May 194360.9AppointedArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
13 Jan 194562.5AppointedBishop of Peru, Military
16 Dec 194563.4AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
18 Feb 194663.6Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194663.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
27 Nov 195472.4DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Gualberto Guevara y de la Cuba:
Cardinal Juan Gualberto Guevara y de la Cuba (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 10
  • c1: LB, 31 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013