Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aurelio Macedonio Guerrero

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Peru

Titular Archbishop of Gabula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1882Born
20 May 190926.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 194664.0AppointedArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
20 Oct 194664.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
25 May 195774.7RetiredArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
25 May 195774.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gabula
19 Oct 196381.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Macedonio Guerrero
Archbishop Aurelio Macedonio Guerrero (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatacaos

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1946, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018