Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cajamarca

Dioecesis Caiamarcensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 5 April 1908
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Trujillo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 15,333 (5,922 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesisdecajamarca.org/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 34, Jr. del Batan 109, Cajamarca, Peru
  • Telephone: (76)36.26.15
  • Fax: 36.27.99

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
5 April 1908ErectedDiocese of Chachapoyas
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Cajamarca (erected)
11 January 1946Territory LostDiocese of Cajamarca
Diocese of Chachapoyas
Vicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marańón
Prefecture Apostolic of San Francisco Javier (erected)
17 December 1956Territory LostDiocese of Cajamarca
Archdiocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Chiclayo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950585,356597,64497.9%28174513,007204835ap1951
1959414,359417,85999.2%3073711,198215623ap1960
1966419,837.0%309390198124ap1967
1970377,853419,83790.0%2663211,807237224ap1971
1976462,528481,72796.0%2262816,518145524ap1977
1980490,000545,00089.9%2532817,500116124ap1981
1990550,000610,00090.2%3353814,4731128727ap1991
1999711,600730,00097.5%4675313,4261211433ap2000
2000733,292750,49297.7%4595413,5791616736ap2001
2001756,678791,79895.6%4795613,5121613237ap2002
2002759,343797,42595.2%4295114,88911614237ap2003
2003761,421805,22594.6%5075713,35811215637ap2004
2004780,330815,43595.7%5065613,93411116237ap2005
2006804,000844,00095.3%5696512,3691516838ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013