Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Yurimaguas

Apostolicus Vicariatus Yurimaguaënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 10 November 1960
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 70,000 (27,037 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Curial Vicarial, Bolivar 208, Yurimaguas, Loreto, Peru
  • Telephone: (65)35.21.28
  • Fax: 35.23.46

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón
27 February 1921ErectedVicariate Apostolic of San León del Amazonas Prefecture Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón
3 June 1936ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón Vicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón
11 January 1946Territory LostDiocese of Cajamarca
Diocese of Chachapoyas
Vicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón
Prefecture Apostolic of San Francisco Javier (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yurimaguas
10 November 1960Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón Vicariate Apostolic of Yurimaguas

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón
195020,13030,00067.1%15151,34218108ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Yurimaguas
196655,00060,00091.7%16163,437328ap1967
197052,00056,00092.9%18182,88821328ap1971
197675,00085,00088.2%12126,250154211ap1977
198079,11687,30090.6%1898,790103712ap1981
1990125,000140,00089.3%211139,615175823ap1991
1999185,820215,07286.4%471116,892135819ap2000
2000188,300219,32085.9%471117,1182135419ap2001
2001188,900220,00085.9%481215,741155419ap2002
2002190,000222,00085.6%891711,176135919ap2003
2003193,000225,00085.8%8101810,722145919ap2004
2004201,500235,00085.7%6101612,593145919ap2005
2010216,000252,00085.7%9112010,800195123ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 22 Aug 2012