Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jesús María Aristín Seco, C.P.

Vicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1954 Born
14 Apr 197924.3Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Passion
23 Sep 197924.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
17 Dec 201661.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Yurimaguas, Peru
8 Jul 202065.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas, Peru
8 Dec 202065.9Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Jesús María Aristín Seco
Father Jesús María Aristín Seco C.P. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cecilia del Alcor, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopVirgen de las Nieves, Cathedral, Yurimaguas, Vicariate Apostolic of Yurimaguas

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Yurimaguas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 1 Oct 2020

Quantcast