Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Izuzquiza Herranz, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

Titular Bishop of Cubda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1925BornMadrid, Spain
29 Sep 194317.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
31 Jul 195832.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 196135.7Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
30 Mar 198761.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
30 Mar 198761.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cubda
7 Jun 198761.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cubda
21 Nov 200175.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
26 Apr 201185.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

MicroData Summary for José María Izuzquiza Herranz:
Bishop José María Izuzquiza Herranz S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015