Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Augusto Cardinal Vargas Alzamora, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lima

Cardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1922BornLima
15 Jul 195532.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
8 Jun 197855.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Francisco Javier, Peru
8 Jun 197855.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissi
15 Aug 197855.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissi
23 Aug 198562.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Jaén en Peru o San Francisco Javier
30 Dec 198967.1AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
26 Nov 199472.0Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199472.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Roberto Bellarmino
9 Jan 199976.2RetiredArchbishop of Lima, Peru
4 Sep 200077.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Augusto Vargas Alzamora:
Cardinal Augusto Vargas Alzamora S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lima

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
  • a cardinal for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013