Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Martín Abanto Guzmán

Bishop Emeritus of Peru, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1964 BornTrujillo
12 Dec 199228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
30 Jan 200944.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
30 Jan 200944.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
19 Apr 200944.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinhel
30 Oct 201248.3AppointedBishop of Peru, Military
20 Jul 201349.1ResignedBishop of Peru, Military

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Martín Abanto Guzmán:
Bishop Guillermo Martín Abanto Guzmán (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Peru, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Peru, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,154
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013