Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Enrique García Camader

Bishop of Lurín, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1954 Born
11 Jan 198126.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
8 Dec 198127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
16 Feb 200247.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
16 Feb 200247.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
7 Apr 200247.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
17 Jun 200651.8AppointedBishop of Lurín, Peru
23 Jul 200651.9InstalledBishop of Lurín, Peru

MicroData Summary for Carlos Enrique García Camader
Bishop Carlos Enrique García Camader (born ) Bishop of Lurín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lurín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 29 Apr 2019

Quantcast