Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Tomasi Travaglia, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lima, Peru

Titular Bishop of Obbi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1939 Born
28 Jun 196424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Feb 200262.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
16 Feb 200262.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Obbi
7 Apr 200262.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obbi
13 Apr 201979.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Adriano Tomasi Travaglia
Bishop Adriano Tomasi Travaglia O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGardolo di Mezzo-Meano, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,166
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast