Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Panizza Richero, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Carabayllo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1944 Born
1 Mar 196925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Dec 199652.9AppointedBishop of Carabayllo, Peru
2 Feb 199753.0Ordained BishopBishop of Carabayllo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Lino Panizza Richero
Bishop Lino Panizza Richero O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Carabayllo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalestrino, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carabayllo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,921
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast