Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel La Fay Bardi, O. Carm.

Prelate Emeritus of Sicuani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1934 BornChelsea, USA
4 Jul 196025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
26 Jul 199964.7AppointedPrelate of Sicuani, Peru
15 Oct 199964.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Sicuani, Peru
10 Jul 201378.7RetiredPrelate of Sicuani, Peru

MicroData Summary for Miguel La Fay Bardi:
Bishop Miguel La Fay Bardi O. Carm. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Sicuani

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Sicuani.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,638
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013