Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimundo Revoredo Ruiz, C.M.

Prelate Emeritus of Juli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1927 BornLima
29 Jun 195022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
25 Nov 198860.9AppointedPrelate of Juli, Peru
5 Jan 198961.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Juli, Peru
29 May 199971.4ResignedPrelate of Juli, Peru

MicroData Summary for Raimundo Revoredo Ruiz:
Bishop Raimundo Revoredo Ruiz C.M. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Juli

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Juli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013