Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Mateo Calderón Barrueto, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Puno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1920BornCajabamba
27 Dec 194727.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Mar 196948.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ica, Peru
13 Mar 196948.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mevania
27 Apr 196948.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mevania
3 Nov 197252.1AppointedBishop of Puno, Peru
14 Feb 199877.3RetiredBishop of Puno, Peru
28 Oct 201090.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Puno, Peru

MicroData Summary for Jesús Mateo Calderón Barrueto:
Bishop Jesús Mateo Calderón Barrueto O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Puno

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015