Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Breña López, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1931BornPuquio
11 Dec 195423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Oct 197342.2AppointedBishop of Ica, Peru
25 Nov 197342.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ica, Peru
31 Oct 200776.3RetiredBishop of Ica, Peru
9 Jul 201382.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Guido Breña López:
Bishop Guido Breña López O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ica

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013