Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernhard Franz Kühnel Langer, M.S.C.

Prelate Emeritus of Caravelí, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1927 Born
6 Aug 195527.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
Jul 1972³44.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caravelí, Peru
21 Sep 197244.7InstalledApostolic Administrator of Caravelí, Peru
26 Jan 198355.1AppointedPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
27 Apr 198355.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Caravelí, Peru
18 Jun 200577.5RetiredPrelate of Caravelí, Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernhard Franz Kühnel Langer
Bishop Bernhard Franz Kühnel Langer M.S.C. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Caravelí

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Caravelí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017