Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga

Archidioecesis Ayacuquensis o Huamangensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 June 1966
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 26,777 (10,342 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 30, Jr. 28 de Julio 148, Ayacucho, Peru
  • Telephone: (66)31.23.67
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
20 July 1609ErectedDiocese of Cuzco Diocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga) (erected)
28 May 1803Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Cuenca
Archdiocese of Lima
Diocese of Popayán
Diocese of Quito
Diocese of Trujillo
Diocese of Maynas (erected)
5 February 1900Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Diocese of Huánuco
Prefecture Apostolic of Ucayali (erected)
18 December 1944Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga) Diocese of Huancavélica (erected)
21 November 1957Territory LostDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
Archdiocese of Arequipa
Territorial Prelature of Caravelí (erected)
Archdiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga
30 June 1966ElevatedDiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga) Archdiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)
1950520,543531,16698.0%5617737,130269863ap1951
1959300,000300,000100.0%5015654,615118250ap1960
Archdiocese of Ayacucho o Huamanga
1966680,562.0%60218102811842ap1967
1970350,000400,00087.5%14570,000441ap1971
1976350,000400,20087.5%3810487,291159347ap1977
1980360,850407,10088.6%348428,591177447ap1981
1990810,0001,020,00079.4%2463027,000811120ap1991
1999554,000584,00094.9%30144412,5901511730ap2000
2000393,365491,70680.0%25143910,0861711147ap2001
2001369,500492,70675.0%22143610,263199947ap2002
2002346,000493,70670.1%3313467,5211811448ap2003
2003324,162498,71065.0%3313467,0471711448ap2004
2004299,646499,41060.0%3212446,8101611924ap2005
2006297,000511,00058.1%3511466,45632113024ap2007
2012560,660659,60085.0%4215579,8362112350ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014