Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Bernardino de la Fuenta y Rojas

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1682³BornLima
24 Apr 172846.2AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
11 May 174159.3SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
7 Aug 174159.5ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
1742¹59.9DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Bernardino de la Fuenta y Rojas:
Bishop Miguel Bernardino de la Fuenta y Rojas (born , died 1742) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 177
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015