Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victorino Alvarez, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1887BornCallao
18 Jan 191426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Dec 194053.2AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
2 Mar 194153.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
2 Mar 195870.4DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for Victorino Alvarez:
Bishop Victorino Alvarez S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013