Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Figueroa Villón

Deceased

Bishop of Chiclayo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1902BornCarhuáz
29 May 192623.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 194542.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arequipa, Peru
7 Apr 194542.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Parnassus
20 May 194542.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parnassus
22 Sep 194644.1AppointedBishop of Huancayo, Peru
17 Dec 195654.3AppointedBishop of Chiclayo, Peru
30 Jan 196764.5DiedBishop of Chiclayo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Daniel Figueroa Villón:
Bishop Daniel Figueroa Villón (born , died ) Bishop of Chiclayo

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013