Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Maria Jurgens Byrne, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1903Born
8 Sep 193330.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Sep 193734.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Jan 194945.7AppointedBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
13 Feb 194945.7Ordained BishopBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
7 Feb 195450.7AppointedBishop of Peru, Military
7 Feb 195450.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
17 Dec 195653.6AppointedArchbishop of Cuzco, Peru
6 Dec 196562.6AppointedArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
29 Dec 197673.6ResignedArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
6 Oct 198077.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Carlos Maria Jurgens Byrne
Archbishop Carlos Maria Jurgens Byrne C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 10
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018