Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Maria Dettmann y Aragón, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1902BornBellavista Callao
18 Aug 192926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jul 194542.7AppointedBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
15 Jul 194542.7Ordained BishopBishop of Huancavélica, Peru
28 Jun 194845.6AppointedBishop of Puno, Peru
6 Feb 195956.2AppointedBishop of Ica, Peru
5 Oct 197370.9ResignedBishop of Ica, Peru
28 Jan 198279.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Alberto Maria Dettmann y Aragón:
Bishop Alberto Maria Dettmann y Aragón O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ica

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 35
  • c4: CB, 4 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Aug 2014