Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María García Graín, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru

Titular Bishop of Alabanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1883Born
21 Sep 190724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Mar 194965.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru
10 Mar 194965.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
22 May 194965.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
27 May 195975.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru

MicroData Summary for José María García Graín
Bishop José María García Graín O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParlero, Spain
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,949, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast