Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Constantino García Pulgar, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Iquitos

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1892BornPajares del Puerto, Spain
27 Aug 190816.2ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
24 Mar 191724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
8 Jan 193845.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Phaena
21 Aug 194149.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of San León del Amazonas, Peru
21 Aug 194149.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
5 Jul 194250.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
30 Jan 195461.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for José Constantino García Pulgar
Bishop José Constantino García Pulgar O.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Iquitos

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 33
  • name: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jun 2016