Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos

Apostolicus Vicariatus Iquitosensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Miguel Olaortúa Laspra, O.S.A., Vicar Apostolic
  • Julián García Centeno, O.S.A., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 1 August 1945
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Peru
  • Square Kilometers: 100,041 (38,640 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle Jr. Putumayo 302, Apartado 108, Iquitos, Peru
  • Telephone: (65)234.465
  • Fax: 242.317

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of San León del Amazonas
5 February 1900ErectedDiocese of Chachapoyas Prefecture Apostolic of San León del Amazonas (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of San León del Amazonas
22 February 1921ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of San León del Amazonas Vicariate Apostolic of San León del Amazonas
27 February 1921Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of San León del Amazonas Prefecture Apostolic of San Gabriel de la Dolorosa del Marañón (erected)
13 July 1945Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of San León del Amazonas Prefecture Apostolic of San José de Amazonas (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos
1 August 1945Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of San León del Amazonas Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos
195060,00065,00092.3%14144,28517235ap1951
1966127,000129,00098.4%32323,96894510ap1967
1970150,040165,00090.9%437413,6594257ap1971
1976190,000210,00090.5%321247,916345118ap1977
1980230,000250,00092.0%3192210,454283913ap1981
1990464,000490,00094.7%4192320,173403629ap1991
1999638,916798,64680.0%12162822,818274523ap2000
2000670,860833,78080.5%11162724,846284623ap2001
2001690,980875,47078.9%9132231,408225222ap2002
2002707,820892,90079.3%10152528,312365422ap2003
2003739,320924,15080.0%12142628,4351405522ap2004
2004770,200951,40081.0%15142926,558485322ap2005
2010913,5001,075,30085.0%14132733,833364923ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 9 Jun 2013