Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sotero Redondo Herrero, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San León del Amazonas, Peru

Titular Bishop of Arycanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1868Born
12 Dec 188416.0ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
13 Dec 188719.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
15 Dec 189123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
15 Sep 191546.8AppointedPrefect of San León del Amazonas, Peru
16 Jun 192152.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arycanda
16 Jun 192152.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of San León del Amazonas, Peru
17 Sep 192253.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arycanda
24 Feb 193566.2DiedVicar Apostolic of San León del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Sotero Redondo Herrero
Bishop Sotero Redondo Herrero O.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San León del Amazonas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia de Don Juan, Spain

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 54
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 72
  • ab: CB, 15 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018