Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián García Centeno, O.S.A.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iquitos, Peru

Titular Bishop of Girus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1933 Born
13 Jul 195824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
19 Jun 198955.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Iquitos, Peru
19 Jun 198955.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Girus
22 Oct 198956.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girus
5 Jan 199157.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru
10 Mar 199157.3InstalledVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru
2 Feb 201177.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru

MicroData Summary for Julián García Centeno
Bishop Julián García Centeno O.S.A. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iquitos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSitrama de Tera, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Iquitos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,585

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018