Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Delicado Baeza

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valladolid, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1927Born
21 Jul 195124.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 196942.5AppointedBishop of Tuy-Vigo, Spain
28 Sep 196942.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tuy-Vigo, Spain
18 Apr 197548.2AppointedArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
7 Jun 197548.3InstalledArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
28 Aug 200275.6RetiredArchbishop of Valladolid, Spain
17 Mar 201487.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valladolid, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Delicado Baeza
Archbishop José Delicado Baeza (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valladolid

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmansa
Ordained BishopAlbacete, Diocese of Albacete

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Oct 2020

Quantcast