Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José María Cardinal Martín de Herrera y de la Iglesia

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1835Born
Sep 1859³24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salamanca, Spain
18 Jun 187539.8SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
5 Jul 187539.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
3 Oct 187540.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
14 Feb 188953.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
19 Apr 189761.6Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 189862.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
8 Dec 192287.2DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José María Martín de Herrera y de la Iglesia (VIAF: 46724229)
José María Cardinal Martín de Herrera y de la Iglesia (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldeadávila de la Ribera, Diocese of Salamanca
Ordained BishopS. Isidro, Madrid
Death PlaceSantiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Santiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
  • a cardinal for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 219, and Page 314
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1897
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 41, Number 13
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Mar 2017