Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Fernández y Balbuena

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

Titular Bishop of Scilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1847BornHuelde
7 Jun 187326.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 191164.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
7 Jul 191164.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
12 Nov 191164.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
3 Mar 192275.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Fernández y Balbuena:
Bishop Ramón Fernández y Balbuena (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013