Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Valeriano Menéndez y Conde

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1848Born
1873²24.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 188738.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
20 Sep 188738.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamasus
16 Apr 188839.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamasus
14 May 189445.4SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
21 May 189445.4ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
28 May 191465.5AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
8 Dec 191466.0InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
3 Mar 191667.2DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valeriano Menéndez y Conde (VIAF: 89222319)
Archbishop Valeriano Menéndez y Conde (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín de Luiña, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 534, and Page 571
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017