Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Luis y Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1874BornBurriana
25 Jul 189622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tortosa, Spain
22 Feb 191540.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
22 Feb 191540.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
29 Jun 191541.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
30 Nov 192147.7AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
6 Nov 193460.6DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Luis y Pérez:
Bishop Juan Bautista Luis y Pérez (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013