Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Fernández de Castro y Menéndez

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1834Born
1858¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 188955.9AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
13 Apr 189056.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
2 Jul 190571.4DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Fernández de Castro y Menéndez (VIAF: 87974147)
Bishop Manuel Fernández de Castro y Menéndez (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oviedo, Diocese of Oviedo

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017