Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Cardinal Garcia Gil, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1802BornSan Salvador de Camba
10 Mar 182725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Aug 185351.4SelectedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
22 Dec 185351.8ConfirmedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
23 Apr 185452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
23 Dec 185856.8AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
12 Mar 187775.0Elevated to Cardinal
21 Sep 187775.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
28 Apr 188179.1DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Garcia Gil:
Cardinal Manuel Garcia Gil O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 166, and Page 433
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 162, Number 892

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013