Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pantaleón Montserrat y Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1807Born
17 Sep 183225.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 186254.5SelectedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
7 Apr 186254.6ConfirmedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
14 Sep 186255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
1 Oct 186356.1AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
21 Jul 187062.9DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pantaleón Montserrat y Navarro (VIAF: 304311569)
Bishop Pantaleón Montserrat y Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaella, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopPilar, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 141, and Page 433
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 170, Number 935
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1862, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017