Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosme Marrodán y Rubio

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1802Born
23 Sep 185754.9SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
21 Dec 185755.2ConfirmedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
21 Mar 185855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
13 Feb 188885.3DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cosme Marrodán y Rubio
Bishop Cosme Marrodán y Rubio (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTudelilla, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pamplona, Diocese of Pamplona (-Tudela)

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,228
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 555
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 165, Number 908
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017